Global Patent Index - EP 0860804 A3

EP 0860804 A3 2000-05-24 - System for the detection and the signalling of objects on the roadway

Title (en)

System for the detection and the signalling of objects on the roadway

Title (de)

System zur Detektierung und Signalisierung von Objekten auf einer Fahrbahn

Title (fr)

Système de détection et de signalisation d'objets sur la chaussée

Publication

EP 0860804 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98102407 A

Priority

IT GE970014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860804A2] System for the detection and the signalling of objects along the roadway, comprising: a plurality of detection means (1, 1'), placed regularly spaced apart from each other along the roadway,; control means (2, 2', 3), connected to the said detection means (1, 1'), said control means comprising means for transducing the signals received from the said detection means and means for the selection of the said signals; and a plurality of signalling means (4, 4'), placed regularly spaced apart from each other along the roadway, connected to the said control means (2, 2', 3) and comprising means for the emission of a signal (104, 204, 104'), said signal being addressed to the drivers in a certain portion of the roadway, at a given distance away from the event detected by a certain detection means (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/04; G08G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860804 A2 19980826; EP 0860804 A3 20000524; IT GE970014 A1 19980819

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08G 1/04 A, 7G 08G 1/16 B

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI