Global patent index - EP 0860901 B1

EP 0860901 B1 2000-08-02 - Housing for electric apparatus an electrical apparatus comprising the same

Title (en)

Housing for electric apparatus an electrical apparatus comprising the same

Title (de)

Gehäuse für elektrischen Gerät und elektrische Vorrichtung mit einem solchen Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour appareillage électrique et appareil électrique comportant un tel boîtier

Publication

EP 0860901 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98410007 A

Priority

FR 9701970 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860901A1] A second housing has a second sidewall (4) and second contour walls (6) arranged perpendicularly at the edge of the second sidewall. Devices are provided to maintain the two housings face to face, with the two contour walls in contact with each other. the maintenance device includes at least a junction unit (10,11) on the external part of the case to connect an external face of the first lateral wall to an external face of the second lateral wall (5). The junction unit comprises a first part arranged on the outside of the contour walls and two maintenance walls (14) perpendicular to the first part and arranged on the outside surfaces of the two sidewalls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24; H01H 71/02; H05K 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01); H01R 9/22 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/08 (2013.01); H01H 71/02 (2013.01); H01R 9/223 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0849757 A2 19980624 - ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860901 A1 19980826; EP 0860901 B1 20000802; AR 011675 A1 20000830; AT 195204 T 20000815; BR 9800617 A 19990914; BR 9800617 B1 20090505; CN 1068698 C 20010718; CN 1192032 A 19980902; DE 69800235 D1 20000907; DE 69800235 T2 20040617; EA 000360 B1 19990624; ES 2150307 T3 20001116; FR 2759846 A1 19980821; FR 2759846 B1 20031226; ID 19899 A 19980820

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160209

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150901

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140206

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-03-01 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69800235

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150307

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: EUROPATENT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800235

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

2000-08-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195204

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990920

1999-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6H 01R 9/24 A, 6H 01H 71/02 B, 6H 05K 5/02 B

1999-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6H 01R 9/24 A, 6H 01H 71/02 B, 6H 05K 5/02 B

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES GB IT NL

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981228

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI