Global Patent Index - EP 0860918 B1

EP 0860918 B1 2001-05-16 - Overvoltage arrester device

Title (en)

Overvoltage arrester device

Title (de)

Überspannungsableiteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif limiteur de surtensions

Publication

EP 0860918 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890030 A

Priority

AT 22797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860918A1] The overvoltage protection system has a pair of electrodes Ä1,2Ü set a distance apart within a housing Ä3Ü and these are connected to cables Ä4,5Ü. The housing has an opening Ä6Ü. When a voltage is applied to the electrodes the local air is ionised and an arc occurs and warms the ionised gas which then flows out of the opening and in doing so cools.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 4/10; H01T 4/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 83/00 (2006.01); H01T 1/15 (2006.01); H01T 4/00 (2006.01); H01T 4/10 (2006.01); H01T 4/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/10 (2013.01); H01T 4/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860918 A1 19980826; EP 0860918 B1 20010516; AT 201288 T 20010615; AT 405112 B 19990525; AT A22797 A 19980915; CZ 9800388 A3 19981216; DE 59800708 D1 20010621; ES 2159429 T3 20011001; GR 3036371 T3 20011130; PL 188294 B1 20050131; PL 324741 A1 19980817; PT 860918 E 20011130; SK 18298 A3 19981007

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120211

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201288 T

- Effective date: 20120211

2012-01-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800708

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050212

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-02-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050212

2005-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AUSTRIA A.G.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-23 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159429 T3

2001-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800708 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201288 T 20010615

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990723

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990226

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GR IT NL PT

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI