Global Patent Index - EP 0860982 A3

EP 0860982 A3 2000-07-05 - Electronic camera with quick review of last captured image

Title (en)

Electronic camera with quick review of last captured image

Title (de)

Elektronische Kamera mit schneller Überprüfung der letzten Bildaufnahme

Title (fr)

Caméra électronique avec revue rapide de l'image captée en dernière

Publication

EP 0860982 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98200368 A

Priority

US 80334297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0860982A2] A camera incorporates a working memory (124) for storing a working image corresponding to the last captured image. The working image is displayed on a display screen (36) in a quick review mode of operation in response to a quick review signal entered by the camera operator via a camera control interface (74) to control processing circuitry (68,72) of the camera. The processing circuitry controls the display screen to keep it in an inactive state until the quick review signal is entered, and returns it to an inactive state after a predetermined time period or when the quick review signal is discontinued to conserve energy. In addition, the working image is displayed in the quick review mode regardless of whether a non-volatile memory is available in the camera or, in the case of a hybrid camera, whether a film cartridge is contained in a film chamber (98) of the camera. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 1/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G03B 17/48 (2006.01); G06F 3/048 (2006.01); H04N 1/21 (2006.01); H04N 5/225 (2006.01); H04N 5/232 (2006.01); H04N 5/907 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/00458 (2013.01); G03B 17/48 (2013.01); H04N 1/00424 (2013.01); H04N 1/0044 (2013.01); H04N 1/00474 (2013.01); H04N 1/2112 (2013.01); H04N 1/2116 (2013.01); H04N 1/2137 (2013.01); H04N 5/225 (2013.01); H04N 5/23293 (2013.01); H04N 2101/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0860982 A2 19980826; EP 0860982 A3 20000705; EP 0860982 B1 20120502; JP H10243336 A 19980911; US 2001015760 A1 20010823; US 2002158983 A1 20021031; US 2004061793 A1 20040401; US 6441854 B2 20020827; US 7215371 B2 20070508

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170201

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APPLE INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EASTMAN KODAK CO., ROCHESTER, US

- Document: DE 69842703

- Effective date: 20120509

2014-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APPLE INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, ROCHESTER, US

- Document: DE 69842703

- Effective date: 20140113

2014-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APPLE INC., CUPERTINO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, ROCHESTER, N.Y., US

- Document: DE 69842703

- Effective date: 20140113

2014-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APPLE INC., CUPERTINO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: EASTMAN KODAK CO., ROCHESTER, N.Y., US

- Document: DE 69842703

- Effective date: 20120509

2014-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842703

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20120509

2014-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842703

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20140113

2014-01-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842703

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWAELT, DE

2013-06-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130523 AND 20130529

2013-06-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: APPLE INC., US

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-05-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842703

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-06-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842703

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-05-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842703

- Representative's name: WAGNER & GEYER PARTNERSCHAFT PATENT- UND RECHT, DE

2012-05-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69842703

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT PATENTANWAELT, DE

2012-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-05-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071022

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI