Global patent index - EP 0861043 B1

EP 0861043 B1 2001-03-28 - SELF-CONTAINED DEVICE FOR SUCKING WASTE MATERIAL AND CRUSHING THE LIGHTER FRACTION

Title (en)

SELF-CONTAINED DEVICE FOR SUCKING WASTE MATERIAL AND CRUSHING THE LIGHTER FRACTION

Title (de)

SELBSTÄNDIGE VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSAUGEN VON ABFÄLLEN UND ZUM ZERKLEINERN LEICHTERER TEILE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF AUTONOME POUR ASPIRER LES DECHETS ET BROYER LES PLUS LEGERS

Publication

EP 0861043 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96939122 A

Priority

  • FR 9601802 W
  • FR 9513817 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9717880A1] The present invention relates to a self-contained device for sucking waste materials, comprising a hood (1) which forms a cover for covering and closing the opening (4) of a waste material container (5), a suction unit (2) to create a vacuum within said container (5) through a suction hole which opens into said hood (1) and a suction conduit (8) of which one extremity (10) is movable so as to be displaced to any point for sucking waste material (22) and the other extremity (7) is connected to said hood (1) wherein it opens out; according to the invention, the suction unit (2) is directly mounted on said hood (1) with its inlet (21) forming said suction opening therein, the suction unit (2) being capable of crushing the lighter waste material (222), and its outlet (23) being connected to a container (9) for collecting the crushed waste material (223), said container (5) forming the receptacle of heavy waste materials (221).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/36 (2006.01); B65F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/365 (2013.01); B65F 1/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9717880 A1 19970522; AU 7628796 A 19970605; DE 69612297 D1 20010503; EP 0861043 A1 19980902; EP 0861043 B1 20010328; FR 2740963 A1 19970516

INPADOC legal status

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-06-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612297

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-04-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981023

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT