Global Patent Index - EP 0861153 B1

EP 0861153 B1 2000-03-15 - DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A FORM IN A PRINTER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A FORM IN A PRINTER

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN VON FORMULAREN IN EINEM DRUCKER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSPORTER DES FORMULAIRES DANS UNE IMPRIMANTE

Publication

EP 0861153 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945976 A

Priority

  • DE 9602117 W
  • DE 19542233 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19542233C1] The invention concerns a device for conveying a sheet (18) for printing in a printer with a carriage (14) which is designed to receive the sheet and travel on a fixed stand (12), perpendicular to the line direction, between a starting position for insertion and removal of the sheet and an end position in the printer. Mounted on the carriage (14) is an engaging and disengaging clamping device (26) comprising a support surface (22) for the sheet (18) and a clamping lever (35) that is spring-biased in the clamping direction. Said clamping lever (35) is equipped with an actuating cam (48) which cooperates with a control bar (40) on the stand (12) in such a way that the clamping device (26) is open in the starting position, closes in the direction opposite the end position once this starting position has been passed and opens again when the carriage (14) reaches the starting position coming from the end position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/10 (2006.01); B41J 13/22 (2006.01); B65H 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19542233 C1 19970123; EP 0861153 A2 19980902; EP 0861153 B1 20000315; JP 2911612 B2 19990623; JP H11500701 A 19990119; US 6059471 A 20000509; WO 9718086 A2 19970522; WO 9718086 A3 19970828

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051106

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2000-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604700 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990728

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980505

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT