Global Patent Index - EP 0861181 B1

EP 0861181 B1 2001-12-05 - CLOSED RAILWAYS GOODS WAGON

Title (en)

CLOSED RAILWAYS GOODS WAGON

Title (de)

GESCHLOSSENER EISENBAHNGÜTERWAGEN

Title (fr)

WAGON A MARCHANDISES FERME

Publication

EP 0861181 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96933337 A

Priority

EP 9604100 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812091A1] The present invention relates to a closed railways goods wagon (10) with an underframe (12) and a roof area (20) and, adjacent to that area and connected to the underframe, long sidewalls (18) consisting of a plurality of vertical panels (30) which are extended, in the transitional area to the roof (20), by parallel wall components (32) arranged in the form of striae and defining a polygonal elbow to the roof. The wall components (32) are interconnected and also connected to the vertical panels (30); at least the striae wall components are arranged like sandwich panels; it is also suggested that the striae wall components be connected to each respective wall component (30) through a pivoting profile (38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/08; B61D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/08 (2006.01); B61D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 39/003 (2013.01); B61D 17/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812091 A1 19980326; AT 210038 T 20011215; CZ 285841 B6 19991117; CZ 9801395 A3 19981111; DE 59608393 D1 20020117; EP 0861181 A1 19980902; EP 0861181 B1 20011205; HU 221289 B1 20020928; HU 9900034 A2 19990329; HU 9900034 A3 20000828; SK 61898 A3 19981104

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GREENBRIER GERMANY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061002

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-09-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-09-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2004-08-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608393 20020117

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210038 T 20011215

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GREENBRIER GERMANY GMBH

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980424

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR IT LI