Global Patent Index - EP 0861197 B1

EP 0861197 B1 2000-11-02 - PACKAGING UNIT FOR ROD-SHAPED PERFUME BOTTLES

Title (en)

PACKAGING UNIT FOR ROD-SHAPED PERFUME BOTTLES

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSEINHEIT FÜR STIFTFÖRMIGE PARFUMFLAKONS

Title (fr)

UNITE D'EMBALLAGE POUR FLACONS DE PARFUMS DE TYPE TUBE

Publication

EP 0861197 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96939083 A

Priority

  • DE 19543090 A
  • EP 9605061 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19543090A1] A packaging unit for rod-shaped perfume bottles, each of which consists of a cylindrical perfume container (9), a metering pump which can fit on the latter and closes off the container, and a cap (11) which can be fitted over the metering pump and may or may not have a clip part, comprises a longitudinal case (1) with container part (2) and lid (3), the container part (2) having at least two compartments. One compartment houses a bottle, either in complete form or in component form with or without the perfume container (9). Another compartment accommodates a number N of identical perfume containers (9) closed off by a closure element (8) instead of a metering pump. The packaging unit contains 25 ml of perfume fluid or a multiple thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00; B65D 85/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2013.01); B65D 85/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19543090 A1 19970522; EP 0861197 A1 19980902; EP 0861197 B1 20001102; WO 9719003 A1 19970529

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010903

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606102 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990707

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980618

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT