Global Patent Index - EP 0861238 A4

EP 0861238 A4 2000-03-01 - HEXAHYDRO-5-IMINO-1,4-HETEROAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASES

Title (en)

HEXAHYDRO-5-IMINO-1,4-HETEROAZEPINE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASES

Title (de)

HEXAHYDRO-5-IMINO-1,4-HETEROAZEPINDERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN VON STICKSTOFFOXID-SYTHASE

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE L'HEXAHYDRO-5-IMINO-1,4-HETEROAZEPINE INHIBITEURS DES SYNTHASES DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE

Publication

EP 0861238 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96937836 A

Priority

  • GB 9605162 A
  • GB 9605700 A
  • US 9617447 W
  • US 717295 P
  • US 901295 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9716430A1] Disclosed herein are compounds of Formula (I) and pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof which have been found useful in the treatment of nitric oxide synthase mediated diseases and disorders, including neurodegenerative disorders, disorders of gastrointestinal motility and inflammation. These diseases and disorders include hypotension, septic shock, toxic shock syndrome, hemodialysis, IL-2 therapy such as in cancer patients, cachexia, immunosuppression such as in transplant therapy, autoimmune and/or inflammatory indications including sunburn, eczema or psoriasis and respiratory conditions such as bronchitis, asthma, oxidant-induced lung injury and acute respiratory distress (ARDS), glomerulonephritis, restenosis, inflammatory sequelae of viral infections, myocarditis, heart failure, atherosclerosis, osteoarthritis, rheumatoid arthritis, septic arthritis, chronic or inflammatory bowel disease, ulcerative colitis, Crohn's disease, systemic lupus erythematosis (SLE), ocular conditions such as ocular hypertension, retinitis and uveitis, type 1 diabetes, insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus and cystic fibrosis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 243/08; A61K 31/55; C07D 267/08; C07D 267/10; C07D 281/04; C07D 281/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/554 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/14 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/04 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 243/06 (2006.01); C07D 243/08 (2006.01); C07D 267/08 (2006.01); C07D 267/10 (2006.01); C07D 267/16 (2006.01); C07D 281/04 (2006.01); C07D 281/06 (2006.01); C07D 281/10 (2006.01); C07D 401/00 (2006.01); C07D 403/00 (2006.01); C07D 405/00 (2006.01); C07D 409/00 (2006.01); C07D 413/00 (2006.01); C07D 417/00 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01); C07D 495/04 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 243/08 (2013.01); C07D 267/16 (2013.01); C07D 281/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9511231 A1 19950427 - MOORE WILLIAM M [US], et al
  • [AP] WO 9614844 A1 19960523 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [X] FR 2292479 A1 19760625 - LILLY INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]
  • [X] FR 1508536 A 19680105 - AMERICAN CYANAMID CO
  • [X] CH 422793 A 19661031 - WANDER AG DR A [CH]
  • [X] EP 0129692 A2 19850102 - HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]
  • [X] AMBROGI V ET AL: "Studies on annulated 1,4-benzothiazines and 1,5-benzothiazepines. IX. Imidazo[2,1-d][1,5]benzothiazepines: synthesis and in vitro benzodiazepine receptor affinity", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY.CHIMICA THERAPEUTICA,FR,EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, vol. 30, no. 5, pages 429-437, XP004040163, ISSN: 0223-5234
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 17, 28 April 1980, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 146818, ARYA, VISHWA PRAKASH: "Heterocyclic compounds having hypoglycemic properties" XP002126763 & IN 145296 A
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 9, 2 March 1981, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 65731, ALESHINA, G. A. ET AL: "11-Substituted-5H-dibenzo-[b,e][1,4]-diazepines" XP002126764 & SU 732264 T
  • [X] D. KORAKAS ET AL., SYNTHESIS, vol. 2, 1994, pages 164 - 166, XP002126757
  • [X] R. CAUJOLLE ET AL., EUR. J. MED. CHEM., vol. 28, no. 1, 1993, pages 29 - 35, XP002126758
  • [X] H.A. HAMMOUDA ET AL., EGYPT. J. CHEM., vol. 30, no. 3, 1987, pages 239 - 247, XP002126759
  • [X] K. TAGAKI ET AL., SYNTHESIS, vol. 4, 1987, pages 379 - 381, XP002126760
  • [X] C. CORRAL ET AL., JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 14, no. 6, 1977, PROVO US, pages 985 - 988, XP002126761
  • [X] A. BAUER ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 16, no. 9, 1973, WASHINGTON US, pages 1011 - 1014, XP002126762
  • See also references of WO 9716430A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9716430 A1 19970509; AU 700078 B2 19981217; AU 7528796 A 19970522; CA 2234641 A1 19970509; EP 0861238 A1 19980902; EP 0861238 A4 20000301; JP 3188715 B2 20010716; JP H11501327 A 19990202

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980602

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE