Global Patent Index - EP 0861310 B1

EP 0861310 B1 2001-12-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DESCENDING CATALYTIC CRACKING BY INJECTING FEEDSTOCK AT AN ADEQUATE ANGLE ON A CONDITIONED CATALYST

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DESCENDING CATALYTIC CRACKING BY INJECTING FEEDSTOCK AT AN ADEQUATE ANGLE ON A CONDITIONED CATALYST

Title (de)

METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KATALYTISCHEN CRAKEN MIT FLUSS IN ABWÄRTSRICHTUNG DURCH EINSPRITZUNG VOM AUSGANGSSTOFF IN EINEM GEZIELTEN WINKEL AUF DEN KONDITIONIERTEN KATALYSATOR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE DESCENDANT METTANT EN OEUVRE L'INJECTION D'UNE CHARGE SOUS UN ANGLE ADEQUAT SUR UN CATALYSEUR CONDITIONNE

Publication

EP 0861310 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97919105 A

Priority

  • FR 9701630 W
  • FR 9611379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2753454A1] The invention concerns a method of catalytic cracking of an oil feedstock by causing a catalyst to flow from a regenerating zone (4) into a conditioning zone (2) in dense fluidized bed upstream of an injecting zone (10), the fluidization rate being between 0.1 to 30 cm/s. It consists in the following steps: regulating the flux of a catalyst flowing through a restricting element (11) into the injecting zone (10), injecting the hydrocarbon feedstock (12) below the restricting element in the opposite direction of the formed catalyst flow and at a predetermined injecting angle based on the amount of movement of the feedstock and the catalyst.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 8/12 (2006.01); C10G 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/187 (2013.01); C10G 11/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2753454 A1 19980320; FR 2753454 B1 19990604; AT 210712 T 20011215; CA 2236296 A1 19980326; CA 2236296 C 20070116; CN 1134528 C 20040114; CN 1208432 A 19990217; DE 69709050 D1 20020124; DE 69709050 T2 20020502; EP 0861310 A1 19980902; EP 0861310 B1 20011212; ES 2169860 T3 20020716; ID 18268 A 19980319; JP 2001503080 A 20010306; JP 4281026 B2 20090617; MX 9803790 A 19980930; US 6099720 A 20000808; WO 9812280 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170915

2017-10-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170915

2017-09-20 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170915

2017-09-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69709050

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 69709050

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-12-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169860 T3

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-03-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709050 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210712 T 20011215

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990506

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE