Global Patent Index - EP 0861317 B1

EP 0861317 B1 2000-01-26 - SOAP BASED CLEANING COMPOSITION

Title (en)

SOAP BASED CLEANING COMPOSITION

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS VON SEIFE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE A BASE DE SAVON

Publication

EP 0861317 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96930197 A

Priority

  • FR 9601342 W
  • FR 9510582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9709413A1] A method for reducing the dehydrating properties of a fatty acid salt soap is described. In use, the method includes adding to said soap, in order to produce on the skin a film replacing the natural lipid film destroyed or damaged by the soap, talc having the following combined properties: a compacted apparent density substantially lower than 0.70 g/cm<3>, and a grain size distribution such that the mean diameter D50 of the grains is substantially lower than 6 microns, and the diameter D95 is substantially lower than 20 microns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 9/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9709413 A1 19970313; AU 6933596 A 19970327; CZ 289422 B6 20020116; CZ 9800658 A3 19980617; DE 69606425 D1 20000302; DE 69606425 T2 20000803; EP 0861317 A1 19980902; EP 0861317 B1 20000126; ES 2143779 T3 20000516; FR 2738255 A1 19970307; FR 2738255 B1 19971017; HU 9900002 A2 19990528; HU 9900002 A3 20000128; PL 183947 B1 20020830; PL 325334 A1 19980720; TR 9800385 T1 19980521

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050903

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020903

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010928

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010905

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143779 T3

2000-04-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. ING. FRANCO RASTELLI

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606425 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980217

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL