Global Patent Index - EP 0861361 B1

EP 0861361 B1 2000-04-26 - VENTILATED WINDOW AND MULTI-CHAMBERED FRAME SECTION THEREFOR

Title (en)

VENTILATED WINDOW AND MULTI-CHAMBERED FRAME SECTION THEREFOR

Title (de)

FENSTER MIT BELÜFTUNG UND MEHRKAMMRIGES BLENDRAHMENPROFIL HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

FENETRE AVEC VENTILATION ET PROFILE POUR ENCADREMENT A CHAMBRES MUTLIPLES DE CELLE-CI

Publication

EP 0861361 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96939811 A

Priority

  • DE 9602157 W
  • DE 19542455 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718375A1] The description relates to a multi-chambered frame section (1) for windows or doors with at least one vertical web (5) - looked at in cross-section - to form an inner chamber (2) and an outer chamber. The inner chamber (2) is essentially undivided to accept an electro-mechanically driven ventilation unit. The inner chamber (2) also has an air intake or outlet aperture. The vertical web (5) and the outer chamber have apertures to provide a continuous ventilation duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/10; E06B 3/02; F24F 7/013

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/02 (2006.01); E06B 7/10 (2006.01); F24F 7/013 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/10 (2013.01); E06B 3/025 (2013.01); F24F 7/013 (2013.01); E06B 2007/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718375 A1 19970522; AT 192212 T 20000515; DE 19681031 D2 19981203; EP 0861361 A1 19980902; EP 0861361 B1 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HT TROPLAST A.G.

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605073 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI NL

2000-04-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192212 T 20000515

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990625

1999-07-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VENTILATED WINDOW AND MULTI-CHAMBERED FRAME SECTION THEREFOR

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GROSS, SIEGFRIED

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEINS, JUERGEN

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRUEGER, H.-PETER

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOLTY, FRIEDRICH

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THOMANN, HARTMUT

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980615

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI NL