Global patent index - EP 0861365 B1

EP 0861365 B1 2000-01-05 - PROCESS FOR ENSURING OPTIMAL ORIENTATION OF FACE WORKING OPERATIONS, IN PARTICULAR IN A HARD COAL DEPOSIT

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR ENSURING OPTIMAL ORIENTATION OF FACE WORKING OPERATIONS, IN PARTICULAR IN A HARD COAL DEPOSIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERTEN ORIENTIERUNG VON ABBAUBETRIEBEN, INSBESONDERE IN EINER STEINKOHLENLAGERSTÄTTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR OPTIMISER L'ORIENTATION D'OPERATIONS D'EXPLOITATION, NOTAMMENT DANS UN GISEMENT HOUILLER

Publication

EP 0861365 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945874 A

Priority

  • DE 9602144 W
  • DE 19542254 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19542254A1] The aim of the invention is to improve the reliability of a process for planning face working operations in a tectonically stressed sedimentation deposit such as a hard coal deposit by determining the working direction, working length, working speed and working sequence. To that end, the face working operations to be planned should be oriented in accordance with the course, course length and breadth of detected seam erosions and projected seam erosions in the body of the deposit based on the tectomechanical process associated with the folding energy and tectonic energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 41/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 41/00 (2006.01); E21C 41/16 (2006.01); E21C 41/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 41/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19542254 A1 19960605; CN 1065314 C 20010502; CN 1207155 A 19990203; CZ 9801386 A3 19980812; DE 19681030 D2 19990311; EP 0861365 A1 19980902; EP 0861365 B1 20000105; PL 326628 A1 19981012; RU 2137922 C1 19990920; WO 9718383 A1 19970522

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59604133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151107

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151107

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604133

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990414

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ERHARDT, WILHELM

1999-03-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LOOS, JOACHIM

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980507

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB