Global Patent Index - EP 0861368 B1

EP 0861368 B1 2000-04-12 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COOLING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID SYSTEM

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COOLING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID SYSTEM

Title (de)

KÜHLKREISLAUF EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DES KÜHLKREISLAUFES

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE AINSI QUE SON MODE OPERATOIRE

Publication

EP 0861368 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940120 A

Priority

  • DE 19637817 A
  • EP 9704604 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19637817A1] A cooling and preheating system, in particular for gear oil in an internal combustion engine, has a compensating container, at least one radiator which can be switched on by an engine thermostat when a predetermined temperature in the cooling circuit is reached, and a water/oil heat exchanger. Also disclosed is a cooling and preheating process. In order to more effectively cool and preheat oil with a more compact and cost-effective design, the forward flow (1) of a single water/oil heat exchanger (5) in the heating phase can be branched off the main cooling circuit (12) of the internal combustion engine (17) by means of a valve unit (3), and the same forward flow (1) can be taken in the cooling phase essentially in the coolant secondary flow (13) by means of the same valve unit (3) from the low temperature area (14) of the radiator (4) or from a separate low temperature radiator (14a) connected in the secondary flow downstream of the radiator (4; 4a). The disclosed process provides for the forward flow (1) of the water/oil heat exchanger (5) to be taken in the heating phase essentially from the main coolant stream (12), which does not flow through the radiator (4). At a temperature slightly below the switching point of the main engine thermostat (9), the cooling mode is switched on. In the cooling mode, the forward flow (1) of the water/oil heat exchanger (5) is branched essentially off the low temperature area (14) of the radiator (4) or off another low temperature radiator (14a) connected in the secondary flow downstream of the radiator (4, 4a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 3/20; F01P 7/16; F01P 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/20 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F01P 11/02 (2006.01); F01P 3/18 (2006.01); F01P 7/14 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/20 (2013.01); F01P 7/165 (2013.01); F01P 11/029 (2013.01); F01P 2003/182 (2013.01); F01P 2007/146 (2013.01); F01P 2037/02 (2013.01); F01P 2060/045 (2013.01); F28F 27/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19637817 A1 19980319; EP 0861368 A1 19980902; EP 0861368 B1 20000412; ES 2146115 T3 20000716; US 6196168 B1 20010306; WO 9812425 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146115 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701435 20000518

2000-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COOLING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID SYSTEM

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MODINE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981110

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980428

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE