Global Patent Index - EP 0861383 A4

EP 0861383 A4 2000-08-23 - MOLDED PISTON HAVING METALLIC COVER FOR DISC BRAKE ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

MOLDED PISTON HAVING METALLIC COVER FOR DISC BRAKE ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

GEFORMTER KOLBEN MIT METALLISCHER ABDECKUNG FÜR SCHEIBENBREMSE

Title (fr)

PISTON MOULE A REVETEMENT METALLIQUE POUR ENSEMBLE FREIN A DISQUE

Publication

EP 0861383 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96940428 A

Priority

  • US 9618221 W
  • US 51080695 A
  • US 57541195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718403A1] A disc brake piston (50) includes a body (52) formed from a plastic material and a cover (70) formed from a metallic material. The body (52) of the piston (50) is molded from a synthetic resin material and is generally hollow and cylindrical in shape, defining an axis and including an opened end (56) and a closed end (54). The body (52) defines an inner cylindrical surface (58) and an outer cylindrical surface (60) which extend axially from the opened end (56) toward the closed end (54). The cover (70) is formed from steel and is integrally molded to the body of the piston (50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 55/18; F16D 65/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 55/228 (2006.01); F16D 65/14 (2006.01); F16D 55/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 55/228 (2013.01); F16D 2055/0091 (2013.01); F16D 2065/785 (2013.01); F16D 2125/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718403 A1 19970522; AU 7731396 A 19970605; EP 0861383 A1 19980902; EP 0861383 A4 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031007

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020628

2000-08-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 16D 55/18 A, 7F 16D 65/16 B

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KELSEY HAYES COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERITOR AUTOMOTIVE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KELSEY HAYES COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980609

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB