Global Patent Index - EP 0861413 B1

EP 0861413 B1 2000-05-24 - GRENADE FRAGMENTABLE INTO LOW KINETIC ENERGY PROJECTILES

Title (en)

GRENADE FRAGMENTABLE INTO LOW KINETIC ENERGY PROJECTILES

Title (de)

HANDGRANATE, DEREN KÖRPER IN MEHRERE GESCHOSSE MIT KLEINER KINETISCHER ENERGIE ZERFÄLLT

Title (fr)

GRENADE FRAGMENTABLE EN PROJECTILES DE FAIBLE ENERGIE CINETIQUE

Publication

EP 0861413 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96938299 A

Priority

  • FR 9601784 W
  • FR 9513590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718435A1] A deterrent weapon, particularly a grenade fragmentable into low kinetic energy projectiles so that persons hit by the projectiles are not seriously wounded, is disclosed. The grenade comprises an igniter device (2) combined with a detonator (3) housed in a sleeve (1). The grenade comprises a grenade body consisting of a number of separate pads (4) provided outside the sleeve (1), made of a non-metal material and secured to the sleeve by respective assembly means (12, 42) which are designed to break up when the detonator (3) explodes so that the explosion projects the individual pads. Said grenade may be used in the event of a riot or violent demonstration, particularly in a confined space, and may be thrown manually or launched from a firearm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 8/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718435 A1 19970522; AT 193373 T 20000615; AU 7577196 A 19970605; DE 69608569 D1 20000629; DE 69608569 T2 20010118; EP 0861413 A1 19980902; EP 0861413 B1 20000524; ES 2146912 T3 20000816; FR 2741436 A1 19970523; FR 2741436 B1 19980130; GR 3034183 T3 20001130; PT 861413 E 20001031; TR 9800867 T2 19980921

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131113

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608569

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-08-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-08-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000401877

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 193373 T

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. D'APPLICATION DES PROCEDES *LEFEBVRE

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEFEBVRE JEAN-PASCAL

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-05-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146912 T3

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608569 20000629

2000-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT

2000-05-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193373 T 20000615

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT