Global Patent Index - EP 0861493 B1

EP 0861493 B1 2000-04-19 - LIFTING MAGNET ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

LIFTING MAGNET ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

HUBMAGNETANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ELECTRO-AIMANT DE LEVAGE

Publication

EP 0861493 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96937253 A

Priority

  • EP 96937253 A
  • DE 19542642 A
  • EP 9604667 W
  • EP 9604343 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/16 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0861493 A1 19980902; EP 0861493 B1 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605007

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111025

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111025

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605007 20000525

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990727

1999-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN REXROTH AG

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980514

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT