Global Patent Index - EP 0861628 B1

EP 0861628 B1 2000-04-19 - Flex-rewinding device for domestic vacuum cleaners and the like

Title (en)

Flex-rewinding device for domestic vacuum cleaners and the like

Title (de)

Kabelaufrollvorrichtung für Haushaltstaubsaugers und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Enrouleur de câble électrique pour des aspirateurs domestiques et similaires

Publication

EP 0861628 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830074 A

Priority

EP 97830074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0861628A1] Flex-rewinding device for domestic vacuum cleaners and the like in which the relevant spool is formed by two axially coupled flanged hubs (4, 5, 6, 7) that are produced by moulding a plastic material in a mould and countermould, without a sliding platen, the coupling and clamping of the hubs ensuring that the electric flex is secured to the hubs by inserting the electric flex, which is housed in a recess (10, 11) formed in the coupled faces of the hubs, between the hubs or, alternatively, by securing a terminal block (44) in the hubs which can be removed by loosening the hub-clamping means and is provided with securing means (52) and with electrical contacts (48, 49) which can move with the hubs and are in electrical contact with fixed contacts (20, 21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/00; A47L 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0861628 A1 19980902; EP 0861628 B1 20000419; DE 69701721 D1 20000525; DE 69701721 T2 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120221

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701721

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120221

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120221

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110317

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701721 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990723

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971007

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI