Global Patent Index - EP 0861681 B1

EP 0861681 B1 2001-05-09 - Snowboard with improved internal structure

Title (en)

Snowboard with improved internal structure

Title (de)

Gleitbrett mit verbesserter Struktur

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse comportant une structure interne perfectionnée

Publication

EP 0861681 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420007 A

Priority

FR 9701024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0861681A1] The snowboard comprises a lower assembly (1) constituting the sliding base plate (2) with metalled edges (3,4). An upper assembly (5) comprises an external layer forming the upper face (6) and the edges (7,8). A filling core (10) between the upper and lower assemblies is composed of expanded polyurethane foam. A reinforcing element (15,16) is placed under the external layer and/or the base plate and impregnated with a reticulated resin. An intermediate sticking layer (17, 18) is interposed between the reinforcing element and the core. The intermediate sticking layer is constituted by a porous sheet coated and sealed on each face with a latex based solution. The face in contact with the core is impregnated with polyurethane foam and the face in contact with the upper assembly is impregnated with reinforcing resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2758730 A1 19980731; FR 2758730 B1 19990226; AT 200987 T 20010515; DE 69800764 D1 20010613; DE 69800764 T2 20010823; EP 0861681 A1 19980902; EP 0861681 B1 20010509; US 6073954 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070119

2005-12-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800764 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200987 T 20010515

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000802

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981001

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI