Global Patent Index - EP 0861685 A3

EP 0861685 A3 2000-02-09 - An agitator blade and a method of agitation

Title (en)

An agitator blade and a method of agitation

Title (de)

Rührer und Verfahren zum Rühren

Title (fr)

Agitateur et procédé d'agitation

Publication

EP 0861685 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98107451 A

Priority

  • EP 94104601 A
  • JP 9512893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0619136A1] Provided is agitator blade which is characterized in that one or more liquid transporting means (12) are arranged on a mounting frame secured to an agitator shaft (2) and the both ends of each of said liquid transporting means are opened to have an upper opening and a lower opening (125,124), respectively. The liquid transporting means include tube bodies, gutter bodies and plate bodies. An agitating method using said agitator blade is also provided. This invention makes it possible to defoam surely and effectively and also effectively mix liquids having different specific gravities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 15/00; B01F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01); B08B 3/10 (2006.01); C12M 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00591 (2013.01); B01F 3/04773 (2013.01); B01F 3/0478 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0619136 A1 19941012; EP 0619136 B1 19990714; DE 69419444 D1 19990819; DE 69419444 T2 20000330; DE 69432802 D1 20030710; DE 69432802 T2 20040506; DK 0619136 T3 19991129; DK 0861685 T3 20030623; EP 0861685 A2 19980902; EP 0861685 A3 20000209; EP 0861685 B1 20030604; JP 2002119838 A 20020423; JP 3253212 B2 20020204; JP 3677227 B2 20050727; JP H06335627 A 19941206

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140322

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-04-16 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140322

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-03-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69432802

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-03-24 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20140323

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KANSAI CHEMICAL ENGINEERING CO. LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69432802

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0619136

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: AN AGITATION TANK

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980423

1998-09-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 619136

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE