Global Patent Index - EP 0861722 B1

EP 0861722 B1 2001-12-19 - Sensor for detecting cocked sheets

Title (en)

Sensor for detecting cocked sheets

Title (de)

Sensor zum Erfassen von Schrägbogen

Title (fr)

Capteur pour détecter des feuilles obliques

Publication

EP 0861722 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101425 A

Priority

DE 19707658 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0861722A2] The sheet-sensor (12,13) consists of a transmitter (12) and receiver (13) in the area of the sheet-turner. The transmitter is on one side (AS) of the printer, and the receiver on the other side (BS), outside the sheet-track. The transmitter is above the plane along which the sheets run, and the receiver below it. The light beam emitted by the transmitter to the receiver runs at a slant in relation to the sheets' plane. The sheet-sensor is in the form of a reflection light barrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00; B41F 21/10; B41F 33/02; B65H 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/02 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B65H 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B41F 33/02 (2013.01); B65H 7/14 (2013.01); B65H 2511/51 (2013.01); B65H 2515/60 (2013.01); B65H 2553/412 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/51 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2515/60 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0861722 A2 19980902; EP 0861722 A3 19990506; EP 0861722 B1 20011219; DE 19707658 A1 19980903; JP 4160647 B2 20081001; JP H10235842 A 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802485

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802485 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980128

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI