Global Patent Index - EP 0861723 B1

EP 0861723 B1 2002-09-11 - Method for cleaning of an inking unit in a printing press

Title (en)

Method for cleaning of an inking unit in a printing press

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reinigung eines Farbwerks einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de nettoyage d'un dispositif d'encrage dans une presse à imprimer

Publication

EP 0861723 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101424 A

Priority

DE 19708435 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0861723A2] In the method the ink-dispenser elements (3) of the inking zones of the ink duct (4) are closed. A further drive of the inker unit (1) serves to return the ink into the ink duct by the cyclical movement of the lifter (5) occurring between the ductor (6) and the friction roller (7). The ductor and lifter cycle are driven more rapidly than the printer. Before the ink is returned, the ink-transfer is separated between the rollers (7-10) nearer the ink duct and the rollers (12-21) nearer the plate cylinder (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0861723 A2 19980902; EP 0861723 A3 19990506; EP 0861723 B1 20020911; DE 19708435 A1 19980910; DE 19708435 C2 20010510; JP 4170431 B2 20081022; JP H10278237 A 19981020; US 6116161 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805463 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-12-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR CLEANING OF AN INKING UNIT IN A PRINTING PRESS

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991115

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980128

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI