Global Patent Index - EP 0861931 B1

EP 0861931 B1 2001-12-19 - Method and device for the production of the yarn from at least two yarn components

Title (en)

Method and device for the production of the yarn from at least two yarn components

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zum Erzeugen eines Garnes aus mindestens zwei Garnkomponenten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'un fil d'au moins à deux composants

Publication

EP 0861931 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810126 A

Priority

  • CH 44197 A
  • CH 120197 A
  • CH 270397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0861931A1] To produce a yarn, from at least two yarn components, before they are brought together at least one yarn component is processed differently from the other, or the other component is given a special treatment or is of a different type. Also claimed is an assembly where one yarn component passes through at least two processing stages, which are used selectively. At least one stage is for compaction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/02; D02G 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2006.01); D02G 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/0266 (2013.01); D02G 1/20 (2013.01); Y10S 57/908 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0861931 A1 19980902; EP 0861931 B1 20011219; BR 9800210 A 19990706; CA 2230431 A1 19980826; CN 1143014 C 20040324; CN 1194312 A 19980930; DE 59802487 D1 20020131; US 6076345 A 20000620; US 6442923 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070217

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *RIETER A.G.

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-03-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060310

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802487 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000808

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR IT LI

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980917

1998-09-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEISS, HANS-JOACHIM

1998-09-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAIER, JOERG

1998-09-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEYER, ROGER

1998-09-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NABULON, WERNER

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI