Global Patent Index - EP 0861958 B1

EP 0861958 B1 2003-06-04 - Blocking/releasing arrangement for a pivoting release element of an electrical striker

Title (en)

Blocking/releasing arrangement for a pivoting release element of an electrical striker

Title (de)

Sperr-/Freigabevorrichtung für eine Schwenkfalle eines Arbeitsstrom-Türöffners

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage et dégagement d'un élément pivotant d'une gâche électrique

Publication

EP 0861958 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98102617 A

Priority

DE 19707759 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2229668A1] An arresting/release device for a swing catch of a working-current door opener has a catch lever which arrests or releases the swing catch, a first safe ty lever which maintains the catch lever in the arrested position and is pivotable with the aid of an electromagnet into a position releasing the catch lever, and a sec ond safety lever which acts on the first safety lever for impact protection of the c atch lever. In order to achieve an impact protection, advantageous from the manufacturing and installation standpoint, the second safety lever is constitute d by a mechanically-decoupled lever of low mass, mounted at its centre of gravity. Th is symmetrically-constructed, vibration-proof, second safety lever secures the firs t safety lever in an impact-preventing position and is magnetically-coupled to and pivotable with the coil core, which is made from a soft magnetic material and ha s a relatively long acceleration path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0047 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04); Y10T 292/688 (2015.04); Y10T 292/699 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19707759 C1 19980820; AT 242393 T 20030615; CA 2229668 A1 19980826; CA 2229668 C 20020521; EP 0861958 A2 19980902; EP 0861958 A3 20000628; EP 0861958 B1 20030604; US 5988711 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808556

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-11-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242393 T

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160209

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110217

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: EFF-EFF FRITZ FUSS GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHA

- Free text: EFF-EFF FRITZ FUSS GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN#JOHANNES-MAUTHE-STRASSE 14#72458 ALBSTADT-EBINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- EFF-EFF FRITZ FUSS GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN#JOHANNES-MAUTHE-STRASSE 14#72458 ALBSTADT-EBINGEN (DE)

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808556 P 20030710

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI