Global Patent Index - EP 0861967 A3

EP 0861967 A3 2000-02-09 - Mobile working apparatus

Title (en)

Mobile working apparatus

Title (de)

Fahrbares Arbeitsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de travail mobile

Publication

EP 0861967 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98103486 A

Priority

DE 19708316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0861967A2] The mobile ram or drilling rig has a sub module provided by the ram or drilling tool and a sub module provided by the mobile chassis (10) and the steering mechanism (16) coupled together via a coupling device (18). The latter has a respective coupling parts (28,30) associated with the 2 sub modules and coupled together via a plug-fit coupling (40,44). The steering mechanism may have a parallelogram linkage (20,22) to which the coupling part for the second sub module is attached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 15/04; E21B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/02 (2006.01); E21B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/02 (2013.01); E21B 7/022 (2013.01); E21B 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0861967 A2 19980902; EP 0861967 A3 20000209; DE 19708316 A1 19980903

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021014

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI IT NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 15/04 A, 7E 21B 15/00 B

1998-11-25 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-11-25 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19981219

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI IT NL

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI