Global Patent Index - EP 0861975 A3

EP 0861975 A3 2001-03-14 - Exhaust manifold flange for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Exhaust manifold flange for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Abgaskrümmerflansch für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Bride de collecteur d'échappement pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0861975 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102983 A

Priority

DE 19708392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0861975A2] The manifold flange (1) consists of a base section (2) of sheet steel with beading (3), which extends at least approx. over the complete outer contour of the section. The section has holder bores (4) for one or more exhaust sockets (5), and the bores also have beading (6). The sockets are fitted, esp. welded into the bores. Fasteners have bores (7) in the base section. The holder bores are located between intermediate apertures (8) with beading (9). The side of the base section facing the IC engine has a raised part formed as sealing surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1872 (2013.01); F01N 13/10 (2013.01); Y10T 29/494 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0861975 A2 19980902; EP 0861975 A3 20010314; DE 19708392 A1 19980903; US 6254142 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010915

2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAERLE, HANS A.

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI