Global Patent Index - EP 0862012 B1

EP 0862012 B1 2002-09-18 - Sound damping device for reducing fluid and body noise

Title (en)

Sound damping device for reducing fluid and body noise

Title (de)

Geräuschdämpfungseinrichtung für Strömungs- und Körperschall

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'amortissement acoustique pour amortir le bruit d'un fluide et d'un corps

Publication

EP 0862012 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98102607 A

Priority

  • DE 19706155 A
  • DE 29718655 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862012A2] The system comprises a wave pipe (10), a port section (20) made from a soft elastic material and a connecting socket section (30), with the inner contour (11) of the wave pipe corresponding to the outer contour (32). The outer diameter of the connecting socket section in the region of its elevations (33) may be larger than the inner diameter of the pressed wave pipe in the region of its recesses (14). Through the variation of the numerous grooves (34) in the outer contour of the connecting socket section and the number of pressed waves of the wave pipe, via the means (50) of a device to produce a noise dampening system, the rigidity of the wave pipe-connecting socket section connection may be adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 55/033; F16L 55/027

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/22 (2006.01); G10K 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/16 (2013.01); F01N 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0862012 A2 19980902; EP 0862012 A3 19990203; EP 0862012 B1 20020918; AT 224517 T 20021015; DK 0862012 T3 20030127

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-02-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040216

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SOLVIS GMBH & CO. KG

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-04 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030203

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805564 20021024

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224517 T 20021015

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TERSCHUEREN, KLAUS-HENNING

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PROF. DR. ING. HAUSER, GUENTHER

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991014

1999-11-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990729

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TERSCHUEREN, KLAUS-HENNING

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR IT LI SE

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI