Global Patent Index - EP 0862018 B1

EP 0862018 B1 2000-11-29 - Device for mounting a burner in a gas duct

Title (en)

Device for mounting a burner in a gas duct

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Montage eines Brenners in einer Gasleitung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage de brûleurs à l' intérieur d' un conduit de gaz

Publication

EP 0862018 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98430005 A

Priority

FR 9702586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862018A1] The apparatus comprises a fuel injection tube (3) with its tip located in the head (2) of the burner along an axis parallel to that of the duct. The injection tube is situated inside a sleeve (6) which delivers air from outside the duct to the burner head, to which it is fixed, and is situated transversely relative to the axis of the duct. The tip of the tube, situated at the end of a bend in the tube, can be moved along the axis of the duct in relation to a guide aperture in the head. The tube itself can be completely removed from the duct, and is linked to a rotary shaft (8) with a pinion (92) on its end engaging with a rack (10) on the end of the sleeve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 5/02; F23C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 5/02 (2006.01); F23C 5/06 (2006.01); F23D 14/24 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 5/06 (2013.01); F23C 5/02 (2013.01); F23D 14/24 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0862018 A1 19980902; EP 0862018 B1 20001129; AT 197843 T 20001215; DE 69800407 D1 20010104; DE 69800407 T2 20010523; ES 2152741 T3 20010201; FR 2760071 A1 19980828; FR 2760071 B1 19990528; KR 100360521 B1 20030225; US 5984666 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130209

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800407

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070221

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070221

2006-03-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060306

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060220

2005-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-02-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-02-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152741 T3

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800407 20010104

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

2000-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197843 T 20001215

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000413

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES GB IT NL

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT NL

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI