Global Patent Index - EP 0862024 A3

EP 0862024 A3 2001-12-12 - Dehumidifier

Title (en)

Dehumidifier

Title (de)

Entfeuchter

Title (fr)

Déshumidificateur

Publication

EP 0862024 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98300082 A

Priority

JP 4207297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862024A2] Aluminium fins of an evaporator are constituted by flat fins without slits to provide ease with which water deposited on the aluminum fins can drop. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/14; F24F 3/153; F24F 13/22; F28F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 1/02 (2011.01); F24F 3/14 (2006.01); F24F 13/22 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/22 (2013.01); F24F 3/14 (2013.01); F28F 1/32 (2013.01); F25B 39/02 (2013.01); F25B 39/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2186959 A 19870826 - SHEFFIELD METROPOLITAN DISTRIC
  • [A] FR 2549947 A1 19850201 - THERMETIC STE NLE [FR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 428 (M - 762) 11 November 1988 (1988-11-11)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 424 (M - 1024) 12 September 1990 (1990-09-12)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 08 30 August 1996 (1996-08-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0862024 A2 19980902; EP 0862024 A3 20011212; EP 0862024 B1 20041006; AU 4829497 A 19980903; AU 730981 B2 20010322; ES 2230656 T3 20050501; JP H10238809 A 19980908; NZ 329335 A 19980527; PT 862024 E 20050131

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090107

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090108

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090108

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-07-14 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080102

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230656 T3

2005-03-24 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1010906

2005-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT PT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031021

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES GB IT PT

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 3/14 A, 7F 24F 13/22 B, 7F 28F 1/32 B, 7F 24F 3/153 B

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT PT

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI