Global Patent Index - EP 0862033 B1

EP 0862033 B1 2002-11-13 - Device for the replacement of a band support roller in a heating furnace

Title (en)

Device for the replacement of a band support roller in a heating furnace

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Ersetzung einer Bandträgerrolle in einem Wärmebehandlungsofen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour assurer le remplacement d'un rouleau support de bande dans un four de traitement thermique

Publication

EP 0862033 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400333 A

Priority

FR 9702365 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862033A1] The device comprises two pairs of lateral wheel discs (1, 2), turning on a shaft (5, 6), each receiving a strip support roller (3, 4) via detachable fixing systems (13, 14). It also has a member for driving the pairs of lateral wheel discs assuring the synchronisation of their angular displacement whilst they are being changed. It also has a central plug (16) provided with a lifting system (17) for realising the stopping of the opening provided in at the bottom of the furnace, in order to effect the evacuation of a roller from the furnace enclosure to the exterior, during the changing operation. There are two adjustable stoppers (18, 19), one for each roller, that can be displaced in a vertical translation for respectively, assuring the sealing of the opening during the change and assuring the support of the rollers during dismantling of their bearings for lifting the rollers out of service and realising their descent from service in order to disengage them from the wheel discs. It also has two carriages (21, 22) moving transversely along the axis of the furnace receiving the adjustable stoppers and their lifting system. There is a drive set for each support roller in order to obtain a rotation of each roller synchronised with the speed of defilement of the strip (B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 9/24; C21D 9/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/56 (2006.01); F27B 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 9/2407 (2013.01); C21D 9/563 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0862033 A1 19980902; EP 0862033 B1 20021113; DE 69809312 D1 20021219; DE 69809312 T2 20030904; DE 862033 T1 19990506; ES 2119734 T1 19981016; ES 2119734 T3 20030301; FR 2760077 A1 19980828; FR 2760077 B1 19990430; JP H10306323 A 19981117; US 5938431 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140213

2015-04-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809312

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809312

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070212

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060212

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060212

2005-02-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050202

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2119734 T3

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809312 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

1999-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT NL SE

1999-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

1999-05-06 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980912

1998-11-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-10-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2119734 T1

1998-09-09 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

1998-09-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI