Global Patent Index - EP 0862239 A4

EP 0862239 A4 2001-01-10 - MULTIPLE FREQUENCY ANTENNA

Title (en)

MULTIPLE FREQUENCY ANTENNA

Title (de)

MEHRFREQUENZ-ANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE A FREQUENCES MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 0862239 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97939221 A

Priority

  • JP 9703159 W
  • JP 26374496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811624A1] In order to stably receive GPS signals and to be attached to an arbitrary position of a car body, a GPS antenna (10) is incorporated in a cover (2) together with a matching substrate (9), etc. An antenna element (1) is connected to the substrate (9). Since the substrate (9), etc., are erected, the grounding effect of the antenna (10) is improved and, at the same time, the antenna (10) does not receive any adverse influence even when the elevation angle to a GPS satellite is low. Since the antenna element (1) is connected to the substrate (9) at an angle from the vertical line, the antenna (10) does not receive any adverse influence even when the elevation angle to the GPS satellite becomes lower.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 5/00; H01Q 1/22; H01Q 21/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/30 (2006.01); G01S 19/36 (2010.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2015.01); H01Q 5/10 (2015.01); H01Q 5/321 (2015.01); H01Q 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/28 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1214 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01); H01Q 5/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9811624A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811624 A1 19980319; CN 1136628 C 20040128; CN 1205118 A 19990113; DE 69732564 D1 20050331; DE 69732564 T2 20060112; EP 0862239 A1 19980902; EP 0862239 A4 20010110; EP 0862239 B1 20050223; JP 3065949 B2 20000717; JP H1093327 A 19980410; KR 100389940 B1 20031024

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050908

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-09-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69732564 P 20050331

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-01-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980513

1998-09-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT