Global Patent Index - EP 0862476 A4

EP 0862476 A4 2000-08-02 - CLOSED-CIRCUIT BRONCHOASPIRATION DEVICE APPLICABLE TO A VENTILATION CIRCUIT

Title (en)

CLOSED-CIRCUIT BRONCHOASPIRATION DEVICE APPLICABLE TO A VENTILATION CIRCUIT

Title (de)

AN EINEN ENTLÜFTUNGSKREISLAUF VERWENDBARE BRONCHIALE ABSAUG VORRICHTUNG MIT GESCHLOSSENEM KREISLAUF

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASPIRATION BRONCHIQUE EN CIRCUIT FERME POUVANT S'APPLIQUER A UN CIRCUIT DE VENTILATION

Publication

EP 0862476 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97934294 A

Priority

  • IT MI961667 A
  • US 9713029 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9805371A1] This invention is a closed circuit bronchoaspiration device (1) having an interspace (21) formed between an insertable tube (10), and a flexible element (20) which is protected from contamination during expanding and contracting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 16/00; A61M 16/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 16/04 (2006.01); A61M 16/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 16/0463 (2013.01); A61M 16/1055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9805371 A1 19980212; CA 2233719 A1 19980212; EP 0862476 A1 19980909; EP 0862476 A4 20000802; IT 1283664 B1 19980423; IT MI961667 A1 19980202; IT MI961667 D0 19960801; JP H11512963 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040629

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MALLINCKRODT INC.

2000-08-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 16/00 A, 7A 61M 16/04 B

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980424

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE