Global Patent Index - EP 0862519 B1

EP 0862519 B1 2000-09-20 - RUBBER BLANKET FOR A PRINTING MACHINE

Title (en)

RUBBER BLANKET FOR A PRINTING MACHINE

Title (de)

GUMMITUCH FÜR EINE DRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

BLANCHET EN CAOUTCHOUC POUR PRESSE

Publication

EP 0862519 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945728 A

Priority

  • DE 9602185 W
  • DE 19543584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718954A2] In a multi-layer rubber blanket intended for a rubber blanket cylinder and joined at its underside to a dimensionally stable support plate, the ends of the rubber blanket are to be insensitive to mechanical and chemical cleaning. This is achieved according to the invention by sealing the frontal faces of the layers situated underneath the covering layer of the rubber blanket at least at one end of the rubber blanket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 30/00 (2006.01); B41F 30/04 (2006.01); B41N 10/04 (2006.01); B41N 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 10/04 (2013.01); B41F 30/04 (2013.01); Y10S 428/909 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718954 A2 19970529; WO 9718954 A3 19970731; CN 1077049 C 20020102; CN 1202857 A 19981223; DE 19543584 C1 19970724; DE 59605927 D1 20001026; EP 0862519 A2 19980909; EP 0862519 B1 20000920; HK 1016939 A1 20020426; JP 3034610 B2 20000417; JP H11501591 A 19990209; US 5934194 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111116

2012-09-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605927

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111116

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111116

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605927 20001026

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981015

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980604

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE