Global patent index - EP 0862609 B1

EP 0862609 B1 2000-07-12 - LAUNDRY DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

LAUNDRY DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE DETERGENT POUR LESSIVE

Publication

EP 0862609 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96932507 A

Priority

  • EP 9604002 W
  • GB 9520519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9712952A1] A detergent composition which effectively softens fabrics. The composition comprises a quaternary ammonium compound solubilised in a nonionic or amphoteric surfactant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/94; C11D 1/835; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01); C11D 1/755 (2006.01); C11D 1/79 (2006.01); C11D 1/88 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01); C11D 1/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01); C11D 1/755 (2013.01); C11D 1/79 (2013.01); C11D 1/88 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01); C11D 1/92 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9406899 A1 19940331 - HENKEL KGAA [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9712952 A1 19970410; AR 003768 A1 19980909; AU 7128496 A 19970428; AU 724175 B2 20000914; BR 9610791 A 19990713; CZ 289267 B6 20011212; CZ 9801013 A3 19980812; DE 69609346 D1 20000817; DE 69609346 T2 20001207; EP 0862609 A1 19980909; EP 0862609 B1 20000712; GB 9520519 D0 19951213; HU 9900093 A2 19990528; HU 9900093 A3 20000228; PL 188709 B1 20050331; PL 326004 A1 19980817; ZA 9607834 B 19970404

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050908

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20050913

2006-02-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20050913

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050908

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609346

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990114

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980225

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT