Global Patent Index - EP 0862881 A3

EP 0862881 A3 2001-12-12 - Mounting system

Title (en)

Mounting system

Title (de)

Befestigungssytem

Title (fr)

Système de montage

Publication

EP 0862881 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301279 A

Priority

  • EP 98301279 A
  • EP 97200473 A
  • EP 97305177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862881A2] A bracket (10) for mounting the head rail (50) or bottom rail of a window covering product, having: a body portion with a mounting aperture and opposed edges adapted to engage the rail; and fixing means (52) engaging the mounting aperture and adapted to affix the body portion to a building structure. The mounting aperture is associated with a convex curved surface (21) of either the body portion or the fixing means, thereby allowing the body portion and the rail supported thereby to be adjusted in position and at an angle determined by the position of respectively either the fixing means or the body portion relative to the convex curved surface. The convex curved surface can be formed on the body portion, and the mounting aperture can be in a circumferentially elongate slot in the curved surface. Alternatively, the fixing means can comprise a support member that is preferably tubular and has: the convex curved surface on one side; means on the other side to affix the support member to a building structure; an elongate slot in the convex curved surface; and a bolt passing through the mounting aperture in the body portion and the elongate slot in the support member and engaging a nut located within the support member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/144; A47H 1/13; E06B 9/266; E06B 9/323

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/144 (2006.01); E06B 9/323 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2013.01); A47H 1/144 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] GB 2267526 A 19931208 - ECLIPSE BLINDS LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0862881 A2 19980909; EP 0862881 A3 20011212; EP 0862881 B1 20040818

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120218

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69825647

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120218

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825647 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47H 1/144 A, 7E 06B 9/323 B, 7A 47H 1/13 B, 7E 06B 9/266 B

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI