Global Patent Index - EP 0862892 B1

EP 0862892 B1 2003-06-25 - Household apparatus with a measuring device for determining the contamination degree of the cleaning liquid

Title (en)

Household apparatus with a measuring device for determining the contamination degree of the cleaning liquid

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerät mit einer Messeinrichtung zum Ermitteln des Verschmutzungsgrades einer Reinigungsflüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Appareil domestique avec dispositif de mesure pour déterminer le degré d'encrassement du liquide de nettoyage

Publication

EP 0862892 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100429 A

Priority

DE 19705926 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862892A2] A domestic appliance, e.g. a dishwasher, has a measuring device for registering the dirtiness of the cleaning liquid. A measured value for the adjustment of the device (23) can be registered during a cleaning program in a preceding cleaning program. The measuring value for the calibration of the device is preferably registered at the end of the preceding cleaning program, directly after the last filling with fresh water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/46; D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4297 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19705926 A1 19980820; EP 0862892 A2 19980909; EP 0862892 A3 19990217; EP 0862892 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808776 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020410

1999-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990708

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI