Global Patent Index - EP 0862911 A3

EP 0862911 A3 2000-04-26 - Use of macrocyclic lactones as fragrances

Title (en)

Use of macrocyclic lactones as fragrances

Title (de)

Verwendung makrocyclischer Lactone als Riechstoffe

Title (fr)

Utilisation de lactones macrocycliques comme agents parfumants

Publication

EP 0862911 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102945 A

Priority

DE 19708924 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862911A2] Use macrocyclic lactones of formula (I) and/or (II) as perfumes is claimed. R = H or Me; and the dotted line indicates an additional bond in the 11- 12- position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/46; C07D 313/00; C11B 9/00; C11D 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 313/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61Q 13/00 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 9/0084 (2013.01); C11D 3/2093 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9732948 A1 19970912 - FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]
  • [X] US 3890353 A 19750617 - BECKER JOSEPH J & DE 2026056 A1 19701203
  • [A] DE 2034737 A1 19710311
  • [A] EP 0424787 A2 19910502 - FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D23, AN 1973-51241U, XP002131861
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198813, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class B03, AN 1988-088332, XP002131862
  • [AD] CAMERON A G ET AL: "MODEL STUDIES ON THE SYNTHESIS OF MEDIUM-SIZED AND LARGE CARBOCYCLES USING THE IRELAND ENOLATE CLAISEN REARRANGEMENT", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1,GB,CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, 1 January 1986 (1986-01-01), pages 161 - 167, XP000673911, ISSN: 0300-922X
  • [AD] FUNK ET AL: "claisen-rearrangement-mediated ring contraction of macrocyclic lactones", TETRAHEDRON, vol. 42, 1986, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH.; GB, pages 2831 - 28446, XP002131860

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0862911 A2 19980909; EP 0862911 A3 20000426; DE 19708924 A1 19980910; JP H10251684 A 19980922; US 6008185 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYMRISE GMBH & CO. KG

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/46 A, 7C 11D 3/50 B, 7C 07D 313/00 B, 7C 11B 9/00 B

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI