Global Patent Index - EP 0862958 A3

EP 0862958 A3 2000-07-26 - Machine for the manufacture of steel reinforcement mats

Title (en)

Machine for the manufacture of steel reinforcement mats

Title (de)

Maschine für die Herstellung von Bewehrungsstahlmatten

Title (fr)

Machine pour la fabrication de treillis d'armatures en acier

Publication

EP 0862958 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104039 A

Priority

DE 29704134 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0862958A2] The machine has at least one automatic attachment device with carrier conveyor belts for reinforcing rods, which are at right angles to each other and are supplied from a magazine. The machine (1) has side rod intake (4), and a rod is conveyed along a track mainly at right angles to the longitudinal direction of the conveyor belts. The rod intake is formed by two friction wheels driven in opposite directions, to move a rod into the machine by friction. A length measurer (9) is located in the area of the rod intake to determine rod length, and feed the length information to a machine control device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 27/00; B21F 27/10; B21F 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0862958 A2 19980909; EP 0862958 A3 20000726; EP 0862958 B1 20050622; AT 298275 T 20050715; DE 29704134 U1 19980827; ES 2244019 T3 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: HUNDEGGER, HANS, DE

- Document: AT 298275 T

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-07-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: BAM AG, CH

- Document: AT 298275 T

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: BAM AG

- Effective date: 20120605

2012-06-01 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HAUSSLER INNOVATION GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120427

2012-06-01 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HUNDEGGER, HANS, DE

- Effective date: 20120427

2012-06-01 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BAM AG, CH

- Effective date: 20120427

2012-05-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAM AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HAEUSSLER INNOVATION GMBH,HANS HUNDEGGER, , DE

- Document: DE 59812874

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-05-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HUNDEGGER, HANS, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HAEUSSLER INNOVATION GMBH,HANS HUNDEGGER, , DE

- Document: DE 59812874

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-05-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HUNDEGGER, HANS, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HAEUSSLER INNOVATION GMBH, 87435 KEMPTEN, DE; HUNDEGGER, HANS, 87749 HAWANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59812874

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-05-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAM AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HAEUSSLER INNOVATION GMBH, 87435 KEMPTEN, DE; HUNDEGGER, HANS, 87749 HAWANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59812874

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812874

- Representative's name: VONNEMANN KLOIBER & KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812874

- Representative's name: VKK PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-03-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120301 AND 20120307

2012-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812874

- Representative's name: VONNEMANN, KLOIBER & KOLLEGEN, DE

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2008-07-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2008-06-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060323

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244019 T3

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-07-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812874 P 20050728

2005-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21F 27/00 A, 7B 21F 27/10 B, 7B 21F 27/20 B

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI