Global Patent Index - EP 0863001 A3

EP 0863001 A3 2000-04-19 - Lithographic printing system with reusable support surfaces and lithographic constructions for use therewith

Title (en)

Lithographic printing system with reusable support surfaces and lithographic constructions for use therewith

Title (de)

Flachdrucksystem mit wiederverwendbaren Trägeroberflächen und lithographische Konstruktionen hiervon

Title (fr)

Systèmes pour l'impression lithographique utilisant des supports à surface réutilisable et constructions lithographiques à cet effet

Publication

EP 0863001 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301592 A

Priority

  • US 81238297 A
  • US 3249098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863001A2] Lithographic printing constructions are removable from a permanent support, which may be a metal sheet affixable (usually by clamps) to a plate cylinder, or may instead be the permanent surface of such a cylinder. In this way, the traditional "plate" is replaced with a thin, easily manufactured printing member, which is separated from the support following its use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/12; B41C 1/10; B41F 30/06; B41N 6/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 1/10 (2006.01); B41N 6/02 (2006.01); B41N 10/04 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 6/02 (2013.01); B41C 1/1033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863001 A2 19980909; EP 0863001 A3 20000419; AU 5645398 A 19980910; AU 722433 B2 20000803; CA 2231011 A1 19980905; CA 2231011 C 20030708; JP H1128802 A 19990202

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061002

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020130

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI