Global Patent Index - EP 0863003 B1

EP 0863003 B1 2002-11-06 - Self-configuring ink jet printer

Title (en)

Self-configuring ink jet printer

Title (de)

Selbstkonfigurierender Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante à jet d'encre auto-configurante

Publication

EP 0863003 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97310715 A

Priority

US 81065397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863003A2] A method is provided for optimizing ink jet printing system operation. A computer is used for interactive control of an ink jet printing system, and ink jet characteristics are stored in the computer memory. The computer can then access and matrix the stored ink jet characteristics. The matrix is interpreted to optimize operation of the ink jet printing system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/02 (2006.01); B41J 2/125 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/02 (2013.01); B41J 2002/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863003 A2 19980909; EP 0863003 A3 19990303; EP 0863003 B1 20021106; CA 2228125 A1 19980903; CA 2228125 C 20031209; DE 69716871 D1 20021212; DE 69716871 T2 20030717; JP H10323977 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69716871

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121231

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111205

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716871 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000124

1999-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990106

1999-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI