Global Patent Index - EP 0863082 B1

EP 0863082 B1 2000-08-16 - Method for introducing flexible food slices in containers and device for performing the method

Title (en)

Method for introducing flexible food slices in containers and device for performing the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einbringen von Lebensmittelscheiben in Behälter und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d'introduction de tranches flexibles de denrées alimentaires dans un récipient et dispositif de mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0863082 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122221 A

Priority

DE 19709412 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863082A1] The packing is filled with square slices (1) of foodstuff wrapped individually in foil wraps with sealing edges (2). Several of the slices stand upright as a stack in a container (3) which is open at the top. The stack is surrounded by the four vertical outer walls (5-8) of the container. The wrapped slices stand on the bottom of the container, at an angle of 60-85 degrees , preferably 80 degrees . The bottom of the container may have a corrugated top surface to locate the wrapped slices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/52; B65B 5/10; B65B 35/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/06 (2006.01); B65B 5/10 (2006.01); B65D 5/50 (2006.01); B65D 5/52 (2006.01); B65D 25/02 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/06 (2006.01); B65D 77/02 (2006.01); B65G 47/14 (2006.01); B65D 85/72 (2006.01); B65D 85/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/066 (2013.01); B65B 5/101 (2013.01); B65D 5/50 (2013.01); B65D 5/52 (2013.01); B65D 77/02 (2013.01); B65D 85/72 (2013.01); B65D 85/76 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863082 A1 19980909; EP 0863082 B1 20000816; AT 195479 T 20000915; DE 19709412 A1 19980910; ES 2150183 T3 20001116; JP H10250705 A 19980922; US 6189294 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031218

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2003-12-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011203

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150183 T3

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-10-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702200 20000921

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195479 T 20000915

1999-12-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR INTRODUCING FLEXIBLE FOOD SLICES IN CONTAINERS AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING THE METHOD

1999-12-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR INTRODUCING FLEXIBLE FOOD SLICES IN CONTAINERS AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING THE METHOD

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980827

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI