Global Patent Index - EP 0863101 B1

EP 0863101 B1 2002-11-20 - Winding shaft with friction coupling

Title (en)

Winding shaft with friction coupling

Title (de)

Friktionswickelwelle

Title (fr)

Arbre d'enroulement avec accouplement à friction

Publication

EP 0863101 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101778 A

Priority

DE 19709078 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863101A2] A friction winding shaft for winding strip materials onto cores (16) has a driven core shaft (20), friction rings (12) surrounding the core shaft and radially acting clamping elements (24). In operation the clamping elements apply radial force to friction elements (28) moving with the shaft which press the friction rings outwards to grip the core for torque transmission. Torque transfer between the friction rings and friction elements is less than the torque transmitted between the friction rings and the winding core ensuring the core is always gripped by the friction rings when the shaft is being rotated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/24; B65H 18/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/10 (2006.01); B65H 75/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/243 (2013.01); B65H 18/106 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2403/731 (2013.01); B65H 2403/732 (2013.01); B65H 2405/45 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863101 A2 19980909; EP 0863101 A3 19991020; EP 0863101 B1 20021120; DE 19709078 A1 19980917; DE 19709078 C2 20020718; US 5971314 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080203

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806305 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020423

2000-09-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI