Global Patent Index - EP 0863290 A3

EP 0863290 A3 2000-03-15 - Roller blind device

Title (en)

Roller blind device

Title (de)

Rolloeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rouleau

Publication

EP 0863290 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102623 A

Priority

DE 19708084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863290A2] Couplings (3) between separate blinds forming a blind arrangement can be connected to a centrally driven continuous shaft. The shafts of individual blinds have journals (11) extending beyond the ends. Each coupling is in the form of a flange and has a mounting ring at the edge for centring the journal. The mounting ring is divided into two half rings (31, 32), one of which (32) is one piece with the coupling while the other (31) can be removed radially and can be fastened to the coupling. Preferably the shaft journals are in the form of caps (10) which can be fitted axially into the shafts of the individual blinds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] DE 3623762 A1 19880121 - LIMBERG HANS JOERG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863290 A2 19980909; EP 0863290 A3 20000315; EP 0863290 B1 20031217; DE 19708084 C1 19981001; ES 2213845 T3 20040901

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PAN-DUR HOLDING GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WEISS, ALBERT, 74747 RAVENSTEIN, DE

- Document: DE 59810429

2016-12-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810429

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE CANZLER & BERGMEIER PARTNERSCHA, DE

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150217

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150216

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150217

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213845 T3

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WEISS, ALBERT

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810429 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

2003-12-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2001-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT NL SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI