Global Patent Index - EP 0863296 A3

EP 0863296 A3 2001-03-21 - Guide vane for steam turbines

Title (en)

Guide vane for steam turbines

Title (de)

Leitschaufel für Dampfturbinen

Title (fr)

Aube statorique pour turbines à vapeur

Publication

EP 0863296 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810079 A

Priority

DE 19709607 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863296A2] The guide blade has a cavity (18) under low pressure, e.g. connected directly to the condenser, inside it, and has an aperture (3) for fluid suction in the region of its rear edge. This aperture has a porous cover (7) with capillaries which are filled with the fluid being sucked during operation. The porous cover is anchored in the blade by a mechanical fixing element (20) in the form of a spring-loaded quick lock. It consists of a bush (21) which locates the cover in the blade aperture. The cylindrical part (24) projects into the blade cavity. A movable mandrel (25) in the bush is loaded by a spring (26) and has a cap (28) on the inner wall of the blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/32; F01D 5/18; F16B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 25/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/183 (2013.01); F01D 25/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0726384 A1 19960814 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]
  • [A] US 4762437 A 19880809 - MITOMI SEIJI [JP]
  • [Y] BEITZ W: "Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau / Dubbel", 1987, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN, XP002125416, 1
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 016 (M - 270) 24 January 1984 (1984-01-24) & US 5718549 A 19980217 - NODA YUSUKE [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 03 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863296 A2 19980909; EP 0863296 A3 20010321; DE 19709607 A1 19980910; US 6007296 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010131

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01D 25/32 A, 7F 01D 5/18 B, 7F 16B 19/00 B

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI