Global Patent Index - EP 0863379 B1

EP 0863379 B1 2001-12-19 - Electro-pyrotechnic initiator constructed around a printed circuit

Title (en)

Electro-pyrotechnic initiator constructed around a printed circuit

Title (de)

Um eine gedruckte Leiterplatte ausgebildeter elektro-pyrotechnischen Anzünder

Title (fr)

Initiateur électro-pyrotechnique constitué autour d'un circuit imprimé complet

Publication

EP 0863379 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400495 A

Priority

FR 9702715 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863379A1] The initiator, connected to an electrical cable (3) with two conductor wires (13, 14), consists of a heat-sensitive charge which can be set off by a heating resistance (15), an electrical circuit connecting the resistance to the wires, and electromagnetic protection elements for the circuit. The heating resistance (15), electrical circuit and protection elements are integrated in a circuit of conducting strips (11, 12) which are welded to the conductor wires and formed on a printed circuit support (10) surrounded by the initiator. The heating resistance is in the form of a resistive strip with the heat-sensitive charge deposited on it, and the electromagnetic protection elements comprises at least one filtering coil or condenser on the circuit support, covered by a layer of insulating varnish or overmoulded insulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/188

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/26 (2006.01); F42B 3/12 (2006.01); F42B 3/18 (2006.01); F42B 3/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/121 (2013.01); F42B 3/188 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863379 A1 19980909; EP 0863379 B1 20011219; DE 69802979 D1 20020131; DE 69802979 T2 20020627; ES 2169486 T3 20020701; FR 2760525 A1 19980911; FR 2760525 B1 19990416; JP 2914952 B2 19990705; JP H10253299 A 19980925; US 2001022146 A1 20010920; US 2002078848 A1 20020627; US 6389972 B2 20020521; US 6539875 B2 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100304

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100304

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169486 T3

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802979 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000412

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990309

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE