Global patent index - EP 0863568 A3

EP 0863568 A3 2000-11-15 - High frequency transmission line capable of improving an intermodulation distortion characteristic in a high frequency device

Title (en)

High frequency transmission line capable of improving an intermodulation distortion characteristic in a high frequency device

Title (de)

Hochfrequenz-Übertragungsleitung zur Verbesserung der Intermodulationsverzerrungscharakteristik einer Hochfrequenzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Ligne de transmission haute fréquence capable d'améliorer la caractéristique de la distorsion d'intermodulation d'un dispositif haute fréquence

Publication

EP 0863568 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98104060 A

Priority

JP 5271197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863568A2] In a high frequency transmission line having a dielectric substrate and a conductor line which is provided on the dielectric substrate for allowing electric current to flow therethrough, the conductor line has a non-grain-boundary oxide superconductor layer with twin walls but without grain boundaries. The high frequency transmission line is in the form of a plane circuit. It is preferable that an oriented oxide superconductor layer is provided between the dielectric substrate and the non-grain-boundary oxide superconductor layer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 3/08; H01P 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 39/24 (2006.01); H01B 12/06 (2006.01); H01P 3/08 (2006.01); H01P 7/08 (2006.01); H01P 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 3/081 (2013.01); H01P 7/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] EP 0636714 A1 19950201 - INT SUPERCONDUCTIVITY TECH [JP], et al
  • [A] A.M. FERENDECI ET AL.: "TWO-TONE INTERMODULATION DISTORTION IN HIGH TC SUPERCONDUCTING THIN FILMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, vol. 2156, 1994, pages 116 - 122, XP002147774

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863568 A2 19980909; EP 0863568 A3 20001115; JP H10256812 A 19980925

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050411

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030825

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEC CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERNATIONAL SUPERCONDUCTIVITY TECHNOLOGY CENTER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI