Global Patent Index - EP 0863976 B1

EP 0863976 B1 2001-05-23 - GLYCINE-N,N-DIACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES USED AS ORGANIC CO-BUILDERS IN TEXTILE WASHING-AGENT FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

GLYCINE-N,N-DIACETIC ACID DERIVATIVES USED AS ORGANIC CO-BUILDERS IN TEXTILE WASHING-AGENT FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

GLYCIN-N,N-DIESSIGSÄURE-DERIVATE ALS ORGANISCHE COBUILDER IN TEXTILWASCHMITTEL-FORMULIERUNGEN

Title (fr)

DERIVES GLYCINE-N,N-ACIDE DIACETIQUE UTILISES COMME CO-ADJUVANTS ORGANIQUES DANS DES FORMULATIONS D'AGENTS DE LAVAGE DE TEXTILES

Publication

EP 0863976 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96938087 A

Priority

  • DE 19543162 A
  • EP 9604817 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19543162A1] Proposed is a solid washing-agent formulation for textiles, the formulation containing: (A) 1 to 60 % by wt. of inorganic builders made from crystalline or amorphous aluminosilicates, crystalline or amorphous silicates, carbonates and/or phosphates, (B) 0.1 to 25 % by wt. of one or more glycine-N,N-diacetic acid derivatives (I), in which R is an organic group and M is hydrogen or a cation, used as organic co-builders, (C) 1 to 40 % by wt. of anionic surfactants and (D) 0.5 to 30 % by wt. of non-ionic surfactants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/33; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/10 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 1/10 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/88 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19543162 A1 19970522; AT 201439 T 20010615; AU 7564996 A 19970611; DE 59606967 D1 20010628; EP 0863976 A1 19980916; EP 0863976 B1 20010523; ES 2157465 T3 20010816; JP 2000500519 A 20000118; JP 4361604 B2 20091111; US 5994290 A 19991130; WO 9719159 A1 19970529

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151106

2016-12-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161227

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151105

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606967

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BASF A.G.

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157465 T3

2001-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606967 20010628

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201439 T 20010615

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991116

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980427

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE