Global Patent Index - EP 0864071 B1

EP 0864071 B1 2001-01-10 - LYOPHILIZATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND FILLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

LYOPHILIZATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND FILLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM LYOPHILISIEREN SOWIE FÜLLANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE LYOPHILISATION, ET SYSTEME DE REMPLISSAGE

Publication

EP 0864071 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96929123 A

Priority

  • AT 9600160 W
  • AT 64895 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720181A1] In order to lyophilize biological and medical materials under sterile conditions, a closable, internally sterilized conveying container (1) is charged with the material to be lyophilized and is sealed inside a disinfected or sterilized charge isolator (10). The closed transport container (1) is then introduced into a freeze-drying pressurized housing (16) which is equipped with a condenser (17) and in which the interior of the conveying container (1) is cooled, evacuated and heated in a lyophilization cycle when a sterile connection has been produced between the conveying container (1) and the condenser (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720181 A1 19970605; AT 1399 U1 19970425; AT 198662 T 20010115; DE 59606323 D1 20010215; EP 0864071 A1 19980916; EP 0864071 B1 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAXTER A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010821

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606323

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198662

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-06-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LYOPHILIZATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND FILLING SYSTEM

2000-05-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LYOPHILIZATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND FILLING SYSTEM

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAXTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAXTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990125

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980505

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI