Global Patent Index - EP 0864105 B1

EP 0864105 B1 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCOMPLISHING EXTENDED RANGE TCAS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCOMPLISHING EXTENDED RANGE TCAS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON BEREICHSERWEITERTEN TCAS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE SYSTEMES TCAS A LONGUE PORTEE

Publication

EP 0864105 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96942809 A

Priority

  • US 9618891 W
  • US 56635795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720230A1] A Traffic Alert and Collision Avoidance System (TCAS) antenna is mounted on a selected forward portion of an aircraft thereby extending the effective forward range of the TCAS. The antenna and ground plane are tilted relative to conventional TCAS antennas thereby aligning a peak of the antenna's radiation pattern along the aircraft's level line of flight. The resulting increased gain directed forward of the aircraft increases the forward range of the TCAS for both receiving and transmitting TCAS signals. The invention is also useful to extend the range of other aircraft systems including transponders. Alternate embodiments include tilting a conventional TCAS antenna mounted on a middle portion of the aircraft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 13/93

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 13/93 (2006.01); G01S 13/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 13/9303 (2013.01); G01S 13/762 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720230 A1 19970605; AU 1131497 A 19970619; DE 69606885 D1 20000406; DE 69606885 T2 20000629; EP 0864105 A1 19980916; EP 0864105 B1 20000301; US 5805111 A 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20161124

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-08-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606885

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990104

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980522

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB