Global patent index - EP 0864140 B1

EP 0864140 B1 2000-05-03 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A VISUAL RECORD

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A VISUAL RECORD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPEICHERUNG EINES BILDES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A GENERER UN ENREGISTREMENT VISUEL

Publication

EP 0864140 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96940029 A

Priority

  • GB 9602955 W
  • GB 9524538 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720293A1] A method of and an apparatus for generating a visual record that extends over a period of time. Data signals are transmitted to a control unit (1), the signals including picture signals from a camera (2) and signals from one or more types of sensing devices (4A, 4B, 4C). A record of only some of the picture signals is maintained. The degree of difference of at least one type of the transmitted data signals from data signals of the same type that have previously been recorded is assessed and only when the degree of difference assessed is greater than a preselected threshold amount is a record of the picture signals maintained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/196

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/1961 (2013.01); G08B 13/19669 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720293 A1 19970605; DE 69608123 D1 20000608; EP 0864140 A1 19980916; EP 0864140 B1 20000503; GB 9524538 D0 19960131

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051129

2005-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051129

2004-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608123

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980619

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT